Reingold, Stephen Michael (CPSO#: 54293)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health Centre
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-6542
Fax: (905) 494-6416
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Headwaters Health Care Centre
Orangeville Site
100 Rolling Hills Dr Orangeville,
ON L9W 4X9
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Canada
Phone: (519) 941-2410
Fax: (519) 942-0483
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

WILLIAM OSLER HEALTH SYSTEM
ETOBICOKE GENERAL HOSPITAL
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke, Ontario M9V 1R8
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Canada
Phone: (905) 494-2120
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

200-1A CONESTOGA DRIVE
Brampton ON  L6Z4N5
Canada
Phone: 416-602-1150
Fax: 289-752-4335
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephen Michael Reingold Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 22 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Reingold ( CPSO# 54293 )

Business Address:
William Osler Health Centre
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East, 5th Floor
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-6542

Business Address:
200 - 1A Conestoga Drive
Brampton ON  L6Z 4N5
Phone Number: (416) 616-8500

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 05 Sep 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN MICHAEL REINGOLD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REINGOLD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 5 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1985