Reisman, Anna Lisa (CPSO#: 51488)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Nov 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Nov 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
9 Edgar Avenue
Toronto ON  M4W 2B1
Phone: 647-888-2113
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Reisman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 16 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Reisman ( CPSO# 51488 )
Dr. P. Kalman ( CPSO# 30729 )

Business Address:
9 Edgar Avenue
Toronto ON  M4W 2B1
Phone Number: (416) 323-9089

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 16 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNA LISA REISMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REISMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 1985