Reiss, Thomas William (CPSO#: 29886)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 14 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 May 1978
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Jun 2008
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2008
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2009