Reiter, Harold (CPSO#: 56863)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Cancer Centre
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone: (905) 387-9495 Ext. 63123
Fax: (905) 575-6326
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Reiter Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Reiter ( CPSO# 56863 )

Business Address:
Juravinski Cancer Centre
3rd Floor
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone Number: (905) 387-9495

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 31 May 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HAROLD REITER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REITER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1987