Reka, Altin (CPSO#: 85196)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 18 May 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Albanian, English

Education:Universiteti i Tiranes, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Primary Care Niagara
800 Niagara St. North , Unit G1
Welland ON  L3C 5Z4
Phone: (905) 732-4451
Fax: (905) 732-1330
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Altin Reka Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 15 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Reka ( CPSO# 85196 )

Business Address:
Primary Care Niagara
6150 Valley Way
Suite 104
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 1Y3
Phone Number: (905) 371-1881

Business Address:
800 Niagara Street North
Unit G1
Welland ON  L3C 5Z4
Phone Number: (905) 732-4451

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2008
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 May 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 18 May 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 18 May 2011 Active View Details [+]
            As from May 18, 2011, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Altin Reka, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Reka to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Reka has voluntarily ceased to engage in the practice of emergency
                  medicine.