Relle, James David (CPSO#: 59521)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3155 Rankin Boulevard
Windsor ON  N9E 3B8
Phone: 416-489-7781
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

6900 orchard lake blvd
suite 101
west Bloomfield MI  48322
United States
Phone: (248) 539-9036
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 29 Aug 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES DAVID RELLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RELLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1989