Rembielak, Agata (CPSO#: 79900)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Slaska Academy of Medicine, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 20 Aug 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 21 Aug 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Sep 2004
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2004