Remington, Barry Kent (CPSO#: 74407)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 15 Nov 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Nov 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Alberta, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Nov 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Nov 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Nov 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Nov 2010