Remington, Jeffrey Stephen (CPSO#: 66725)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
200 Catharine St
Port Colborne ON  L3K4K8
Phone: 2894785221
Fax: 9058349067
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeffrey S. Remington Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 13 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Remington ( CPSO# 66725 )

Business Address:
Andrew Street Family Health Centre
16 Andrew Street
Kitchener ON  N2H 5R2
Phone Number: (519) 804-9234

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital Dunnville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFREY STEPHEN REMINGTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REMINGTON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1995