Rempel, Elfrieda (CPSO#: 75741)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 26 Aug 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Georgetown Medical Associates
199 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 0E3
Phone: (905) 873-3000
Fax: (905) 873-0800
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2000
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2002
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 05 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2010
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 26 Aug 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 26 Aug 2016 Active View Details [+]
            As from August 26, 2016, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Elfrieda Rempel, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Rempel to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:


                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")

                                                  of

                                          DR. ELFRIEDA REMPEL
                                            ("Dr. Rempel")

                                                  to 

                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")




            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;

                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Rempel, certificate of registration number 75741, am a member of
                  the College.  The College has received information regarding my standard
                  of practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Rempel, acknowledge that the College initiated an investigation
                  bearing File Number 7215283 (the "Investigation") into whether I engaged
                  in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my family practice.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Rempel, acknowledge and agree that I am bound by this Undertaking
                  from the date on which I sign it. 

            (5)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Rempel, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), for  six (6) months ("Clinical Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Rempel, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s). The
                        Clinical Supervisor(s) will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP") attached as Appendix
                              "B";
                  
                        (ii)  The Clinical Supervisor(s) shall meet with me two times in
                              the first month to include one half-day of observation in my
                              practice, and to review twenty (20) charts each visit during
                              that month;
                  
                        (iii) With College approval, the Clinical Supervisor(s) shall meet
                              with me once a month thereafter to review twenty (20) chart
                              each visit;
                  
                        (iv)  Discuss any concerns arising from the observation and/chart
                              reviews;
                  
                        (v)   Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                  
                        (vi)  Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (vii) Submit written reports to the College following the first,
                              third and six months of supervision, or more frequently if
                              the Clinical Supervisor(s) has concerns about my standard of
                              practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Rempel, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the educational
                        needs identified in the IEP set out at Appendix "B" to my
                        Undertaking and concerns that may arise during the period of
                        Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Rempel, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" attached, and to abide by the
                        recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Rempel, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking, is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Rempel, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Rempel, agree that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (6)(e) and/or
                        (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Rempel, agree that if I am required to cease practise as a
                        result of section (6)(g) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
                  (i)   I, Dr. Rempel, agree that if I intend to take more than 4 days off
                        work in any given week, I will notify the College of my intention.
                        I agree that if I am off more than 4 days per week, this week will
                        not count towards my six month supervision period. 
                  
            (6)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Rempel, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete the following professional education at the earliest
                        possible opportunity:
                  
                        (i)   a program(s) satisfactory to the College in: 
                  
                              1.    medical record keeping; and
                  
                              2.    one on one instruction by an instructor acceptable to
                                    the College to address issues in communication and
                                    office management. 
                  
                        (ii)  all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix
                              "B" including providing a written summary to the College, and
                              to my Clinical Supervisor for review, of the following
                              policies within three months of the execution of this
                              Undertaking:
                              1.    CPSO Policy #4-12 - Medical Records;
                              2.    CPSO Policy #1-11 - Test Results Management; and
                              3.    CPSO Policy #2-12 - Third Party Reports.
                  
                        (iii) any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor(s).
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Rempel, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the professional education set out in
                        section (7)(a) within one (1) month of completing it.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Rempel, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided
                        to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        professional education set out in section (7)(a).
                  
            (7)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Rempel, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after
                        the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (3)
                        above and Appendix "A" attached and completion of the professional
                        education set out above, I will submit to a Reassessment of my
                        practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors selected
                        by the College (the "Assessor(s)").  I acknowledge and agree that
                        the Reassessment may include a chart review, direct observation of
                        my care, interviews with colleagues and co-workers, feedback from
                        patients and any other tools deemed necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Rempel, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment,
                        conducted under the term of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Rempel, acknowledge and agree that my Clinical Supervisor(s)
                        may receive and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may
                        discuss with the Assessor(s) any issues or concerns arising from
                        the Reassessment.  I also acknowledge that the results of the
                        Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and
                        the report may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
            (8)   Transfer of Records

                  (a)   I, Dr. Rempel, undertake to transfer all paper records currently
                        stored by me to the storage site used by the other physicians at
                        Georgetown Medical Associates within three (3) months of execution
                        of this Undertaking and ensure the paper records are retained in
                        accordance with the College's Medical Records Policy.
                  
            (9)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Rempel, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within
                        fifteen (15) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I
                        further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Rempel, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s)
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Rempel, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution
                        that may have relevant information, in order for the College to
                        monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Rempel, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
                        form(s), attached hereto as Appendix "C". 
                  
            (10)  I, Dr. Rempel, undertake to comply with this Undertaking and acknowledge
                  that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute
                  an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in
                  a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee of the
                  College.

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (11)  I, Dr. Rempel, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (12)  I, Dr. Rempel, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for payment
                  of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (13)  I, Dr. Rempel, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand
                  the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent
                  legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived
                  my right to do so.

            (14)  I, Dr. Rempel, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes
                  terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for
                  the purposes of section 23 of the Code. I understand that this
                  Undertaking shall be information on the College's Register that is
                  available to the public during the time period that the Undertaking
                  remains in effect.

            (15)  I, Dr. Rempel, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on the
                  College's Register that is available to the public during the time period
                  that this Undertaking remains in effect:

                        Dr. Rempel was the subject of a College investigation into whether
                        she engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in her
                        family practice.  As a result of the investigation:
                  
                        *     Dr. Rempel will practise under the guidance of a Clinical
                              Supervisor acceptable to the College for six (6) months. 
                        *     Dr. Rempel will engage in professional education in medical
                              records, communication and office management.
                        *     Dr. Rempel will transfer inactive patient records to secure
                              storage.
                        *     Dr. Rempel's practice will be reassessed by an assessor
                              selected by the College within six (6) months of the end of
                              the period of Clinical Supervision and professional
                              education.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (16)  I, Dr. Rempel, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the professional education set
                  out in section (6) above and to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or
                  Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (17)  I, Dr. Rempel, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and to
                  provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that
                  led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any
                  information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.

            (18)  I, Dr. Rempel, give my irrevocable consent to any person who facilitates
                  my completion of the professional education set out in section (6) above,
                  and to all Clinical Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to
                  disclose to the College, and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A";
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (e)   which comes to his or her attention in the course of providing the
                        professional education set out in section (6) above and which he or
                        she reasonably believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my
                        patients.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: August 26, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Elfrieda Rempel to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective August 26, 2016:

Dr. Rempel was the subject of a College investigation into whether she engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in her family practice. As a result of the investigation:

• Dr. Rempel will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for six (6) months.

• Dr. Rempel will engage in professional education in medical records, communication and office management.

• Dr. Rempel will transfer inactive patient records to secure storage.

• Dr. Rempel’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within six (6) months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision and professional education.