Rempel, Jeremy Lowell (CPSO#: 87558)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeremy L. Rempel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 24 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 14 Jul 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 27 Aug 2007 to 21 Sep 2007
Elective Trainee - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 15 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 7 - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 16 Mar 2012
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Sep 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012