Renaud, Deborah Lynn (CPSO#: 64998)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Div of Child & Adolescent Neurology
Mayo - 16th Floor
Mayo Clinic
200 First Street S W
Rochester MN  55905
United States
Phone: (507) 284-3372
Fax: (507) 284-0727

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Minnesota

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Neurology Effective: 31 May 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEBORAH LYNN RENAUD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RENAUD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 5 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Resident 5 - Paediatric Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1993