Renaud, Monique Marguerite (CPSO#: 88371)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Maitland Valley Medical Centre
180 Cambria Rd. N
Goderich ON  N7A4N8
Phone: 5195246060
Fax: 5195245225
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Reddington & Renaud Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 05 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Renaud ( CPSO# 88371 )
Dr. M. Reddington ( CPSO# 90533 )

Business Address:
Maitland Valley Medical Centre
180 Cambria Road North
Goderich ON  N7A 4N8
Phone Number: (519) 524-6060

Business Address:
274 Huron Road
Goderich ON  N7A 3A2
Phone Number: (519) 524-8316

Business Address:
Alexandria Marine & General Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
120 Napier Street
Goderich ON  N7A 1W5
Phone Number: (519) 524-8689

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MONIQUE MARGUERITE RENAUD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RENAUD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2010