Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Rendell, Wallace Boyd (CPSO#: 15126)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1954

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 24 Nov 1964 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 May 1955
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jun 2002