Render-Teixeira, Caroline Louise (CPSO#: 76360)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jan 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jan 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 400, 85 The East Mall
Toronto ON  M8Z 5W4
Phone: (416) 621-2220
Fax: (416) 621-2203
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Fernando Teixeira Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 07 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Render-Teixeira ( CPSO# 76360 )
Dr. F. Teixeira ( CPSO# 71526 )

Business Address:
Department of Emergency Medicine
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5095

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Dec 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROLINE LOUISE RENDER-TEIXEIRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RENDER-TEIXEIRA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2004