Renfrew, Paul Douglas (CPSO#: 59399)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Feb 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 09 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL DOUGLAS RENFREW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RENFREW is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Feb 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 1990