Renner, Eberhard Ludwig (CPSO#: 87645)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 Nov 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 Nov 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German

Education:University of Basel, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eberhard Renner Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 14 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: University Health Network Liver Transplant Program 585 University Avenue Toronto ON M5G 2N2
Date Received: 17 Nov 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Gastroenterology Effective: 02 Oct 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 25 Aug 2010
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 16 Aug 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Nov 2016