Rennie, James Stuart (CPSO#: 23564)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Oct 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Oct 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
300 North Service Road West
Oakville ON  L6M 2S2
Phone: (905) 338-3730
Fax: (905) 338-3731
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

5292 Walkers Line
Burlington ON  L7M 0R1
Canada
Phone: (905) 319-0938
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. S. Rennie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 22 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Rennie ( CPSO# 23564 )

Business Address:
300 North Service Road West
Oakville ON  L6M 2S2
Phone Number: (905) 338-3730

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES STUART RENNIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RENNIE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1971
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 24 Jul 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Jun 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 1987