Rennie, John Mark (CPSO#: 25711)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 22 Oct 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Oct 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 11 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1977 to 30 Jun 1978
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 May 2006
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 01 May 2006
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 01 Jun 2007
Suspension of registration imposed: Board of Inquiry Effective: 04 Sep 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Oct 2009

Concerns

Source: Discipline Committee
Active Date: October 22, 2009
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Undertaking by Dr. John Mark Rennie to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the “College”). (NOTE: This is a summary of the undertaking. For the complete terms, contact the College’s Registration Department):

I, Dr. John Mark Rennie:

1.).Hereby resign from the College, effective immediately.
2).Undertake not to apply or re-apply for a licence to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
3).Consent to the terms of this undertaking being entered on the register as information that is available to the public.
4).Acknowledge that, in exchange for this undertaking, the College agrees to withdraw the allegations contained in the Notice of Hearing dated June 10, 2004 and September 2, 2009 regarding sexual abuse, sexual impropriety, disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct and incompetence.
6).Agree that, in the event that the College should become aware that I have either applied, re-applied or attempted to apply or re-apply for a licence to practise medicine in any jurisdiction, the College shall have the right to proceed with a disciplinary proceeding on the basis of a breach of this undertaking and, if successful, shall have the right to proceed with the prosecution of the allegations contained in the Notice of Hearing dated June 10, 2004 and September 2, 2009.