Renouf, Tia Suzanne Moore (CPSO#: 54287)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 27 Oct 1987

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Oct 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 1998 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Dec 1997 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Oct 1987