Renwick, Sherri Anne (CPSO#: 71656)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3500 Fallowfield Road
Nepean ON  K2J4A7
Phone: 613-843-1718
Fax: 613-843-0201
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sherri Renwick Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 20 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Renwick ( CPSO# 71656 )

Business Address:
3500 Fallowfield Road
Ottawa ON  K2J 4A7
Phone Number: (613) 843-1718

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Manitoulin Health Centre Little Current

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHERRI ANNE RENWICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RENWICK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Oct 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1999