Renzi, Samuele (CPSO#: 107459)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 05 Sep 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Florence, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6707
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMUELE RENZI may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. RENZI is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. RENZI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. RENZI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. RENZI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. RENZI ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. RENZI ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 04 Sep 2015
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 05 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018