Rerri, Bernard Eseroghene (CPSO#: 70595)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ibadan, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B. Rerri Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 27 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 11 Sep 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 15 May 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012