Ressler, Ladislaus Josef (CPSO#: 83824)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Sep 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 13 Sep 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German, Hungarian, Romanian

Education:Medical University of Semmelweis, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Cardiac Surgery
University Ottawa Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 761-4708
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. L. J. Ressler Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 10 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Ressler ( CPSO# 83824 )

Business Address:
Division of Cardiac Surgery
University of Ottawa Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone Number: (613) 761-4220

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiac Surgery Effective: 13 Sep 2006 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 31 Oct 2005 to 11 Dec 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 12 Dec 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Aug 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 12 Sep 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 May 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 12 Sep 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 31 May 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 17 May 2012 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Ladislaus Josef Ressler may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Surgery,
                        Division  of  Cardiac  Surgery,  University of Ottawa, in which Dr.
                        Ressler holds an academic appointment  at  the  rank  of  Associate
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The  certificate of registration will expires when Dr. Ressler no  longer
                  holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.