Retnakaran, Ravi Rajan (CPSO#: 73571)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Leadership Sinai Ctre for Diabetes
Mount Sinai Hospital
Mailbox 21 Suite L5 025
60 Murray Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 3941
Fax: (416) 586-8853
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 15 Sep 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAVI RAJAN RETNAKARAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RETNAKARAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 May 2006
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2003