Retrouvey, Helene (CPSO#: 103861)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jul 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 21 Jul 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Toronto
Division of Plastic Surgery
The Rotman Stewart Building Rm 508
149 College Street 5th Floor
Toronto ON  M5T 1P5
Phone: (416) 978-8534
Electoral District: 10

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Jul 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 02 Jun 2017 Active View Details [+]
            Practice Within the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (1)   Dr.   Helene  Retrouvey  shall  practise  medicine  as  required  by  the
                  postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. Retrouvey is enrolled
                  at the University of Toronto.

            (2)   In  Dr.  Retrouvey's  practice  in  the  postgraduate  medical  education
                  program, Dr. Retrouvey shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-
                  patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the
                  department  where  Dr.  Retrouvey  is properly practising medicine and to
                  which postgraduate trainees are regularly  assigned  by the department as
                  part of its program of postgraduate medical education.

            (3)   In  Dr.  Retrouvey's  practice  in  the  postgraduate  medical  education
                  program, Dr. Retrouvey shall not charge a fee for medical services.

            Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (4)   Dr. Retrouvey may practise medicine in the burn unit and to the extent of
                  her  employment  at  Sunnybrook  Health  Sciences  Centre,  while   under
                  supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

            (5)   In  Dr.  Retrouvey's  practice specified in paragraph (4),  Dr. Retrouvey
                  may not charge a fee for medical services.

            Expiry of Certificate

            (6)   This  certificate  of  registration   expires,  and  Dr.  Retrouvey  must
                  thereupon cease all practice both in and outside the postgraduate medical
                  education program, on the earlier of the following times:

                  (a)   when  Dr.  Retrouvey  is  no  longer  enrolled   in  a  program  of
                        postgraduate  medical  education  provided by a medical  school  in
                        Ontario, or
                  
                  (b)   when Dr. Retrouvey no longer holds  Canadian citizenship, permanent
                        resident  status,  or a valid employment  authorization  under  the
                        Immigration Act (Canada).
                  
            Termination of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (7)   This  certificate  automatically   converts  to  a  regular  Postgraduate
                  Education  certificate  and Dr.  Retrouvey  must  immediately  cease  all
                  practice outside the postgraduate medical education program if any one of
                  the following occurs:

                  (a)   the supervisor identified  in paragraph (4) notifies the College of
                        any concerns regarding Dr. Retrouvey's  practice, including but not
                        limited  to  concerns  regarding  knowledge,   skill,  judgment  or
                        attitude;
                  
                  (b)   the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing  to continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Retrouvey's practice;
                  
                  (c)   the Postgraduate Dean informs the College that the medical school's
                        approval  for  Dr.   Retrouvey  to  engage in practice outside  the
                        postgraduate medical education program has been withdrawn;
                  
                  (d)   when  Dr.  Retrouvey's  employment as specified  in  paragraph  (4)
                        ceases; or
                  
                  (e)   if Dr. Retrouvey takes a  leave of absence, or transfers to another
                        program,  from  the postgraduate  education  program  specified  in
                        paragraph (1).
                  
            Resumption of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (8)   In  the  event  of  conversion   to   a  regular  Postgraduate  Education
                  certificate  under  paragraph  (7) or expiry  of  the  certificate  under
                  paragraph (7), Dr. Retrouvey may  not  resume  any  practice  outside the
                  postgraduate  medical education program under the restricted registration
                  for residents policy until Dr. Retrouvey applies for a new certificate of
                  registration and obtains approval by the Registration Committee.



            Note: This certificate  is  issued  on  July  21,  2016.   In  accordance  with
                  paragraph  6(a),  this  certificate  of  registration expires on June 30,
                  2018.  All practice must cease on that date.

                  Practice  outside  the  postgraduate  medical   education   program  must
                  immediately cease upon any of the events in paragraph 7.