Retson, Jillie Elizabeth Marie (CPSO#: 84908)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kenora Medical Associates
45 Wolsley Street
Kenora ON  P9N 3W7
Phone: (807) 468-3021
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jillie Retson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 25 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Retson ( CPSO# 84908 )

Business Address:
Kenora Medical Associates
45 Wolsley Street
Kenora ON  P9N 3W7
Phone Number: (807) 468-3021

Business Address:
21 Sylvan Street
Kenora ON  P9N 3W7
Phone Number: (807) 468-9861

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 13 Aug 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JILLIE ELIZABETH MARIE RETSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RETSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 17 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2009