Reubeni-Zaltz, Renat (CPSO#: 65333)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: Reubeni, Renat (used until: 01 Apr 1996 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
Cardiac Rehab and prevention
East wing, 8th floor
399 Bathurst St.
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5800 Ext. 2858
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RENAT REUBENI-ZALTZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REUBENI-ZALTZ is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1993