Revel, Ariel (CPSO#: 73279)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Nov 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Nov 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The Hebrew University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 26 Oct 2004 to 30 Nov 2004
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Nov 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 30 Nov 2004