Rextin, Gulrukh Samina (CPSO#: 103850)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Dec 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Dec 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Pushto, Urdu

Education:University of Peshawar, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London InterCommunity Health Centre
Unit 7
1355 Huron Street
London ON  N5V 1R9
Phone: (519) 659-6399
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Student Health Services
Room 11, UCC
1151 Richmond Street
London ON  N6A 3K7
Canada
Phone: 519-661-3030
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Huron Medical Centre
1472 Huron St
London ON  N5V 2E5
Canada
Phone: 519-601-6640
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rextin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Rextin ( CPSO# 103850)

Business Address:
London InterCommunity Health Centre
7 - 1355 Huron Street
London ON  N5V 2E3
Phone Number: (519) 659-6399

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Dec 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GULRUKH SAMINA REXTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REXTIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 23 Sep 2014
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2016