Reyes, Celia Ang (CPSO#: 31277)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 May 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 May 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish, Tagalog

Education:University of Santo Tomas, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
250 N Compass Dr
Ft Lauderdale FL  33308
United States
Phone: (954) 829-5194

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Florida

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 09 Jun 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CELIA ANG REYES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REYES is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 23 Jul 1973 to 15 Jun 1974
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 1980 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 27 Feb 1981 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Dec 1979
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 08 Feb 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 May 2007