Reynolds, Kenneth John (CPSO#: 24869)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kenneth Reynolds Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 29 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: RSRS, 111 St. Regis Crescent South, Toronto, ON, M3J 1Y6, (416) 398-0638 or 1(888) 563-3732
Date Received: 06 Jun 2016

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: September 1, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the voluntary cease-to-practise Undertaking given by Dr. Kenneth John Reynolds to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective September 1, 2015:

Dr. Reynolds has ceased to practise medicine due to disability and therefore cannot see patients or provide any medical advice or services.