Reynolds, Richard Albert Keith (CPSO#: 61479)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 02 Dec 1992

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Dec 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 21 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 1990 to 31 Dec 1990
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1989
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Dec 1992