Reynolds, Stephen William Alexander (CPSO#: 95048)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 23 May 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 23 May 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Calgary, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 06 Jun 2011 to 24 Jun 2011
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 05 May 2014 to 23 May 2014
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 May 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 May 2014