Reynolds, Stuart Frederick (CPSO#: 79875)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Health Records University Health Network Toronto, ON
Date Received: 12 Jun 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 1999 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jun 2014