Reynolds, Teresa Beth (CPSO#: 71438)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Golden Plough Lodge
983 Burnham St.
Cobourg ON  K9A 5J6
Phone: (905) 372-8759
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

60 Swayne St.
Cobourg ON  K9A 1K5
Canada
Phone: 905-372-2245
County: County of Northumberland
Electoral District: 06

297 Division St.
Cobourg ON  K9A 3R2
Canada
Phone: 905-377-9925
County: County of Northumberland
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Teresa Reynolds Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 13 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Reynolds ( CPSO# 71438 )

Business Address:
Golden Plough Nursing Home
983 Burnham Street
Cobourg ON  K9A 5J6
Phone Number: (905) 372-8759

Business Address:
60 Swayne Street
Cobourg ON  K9A 1K5
Phone Number: (905) 372-2245

Business Address:
297 Division Street
Cobourg ON  K9A 3R2

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TERESA BETH REYNOLDS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REYNOLDS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999