Rezaiefar, Parisa (CPSO#: 76093)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Persian

Education:McMaster University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bruyere Family Medicine Centre
75 Bruyere Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C8
Phone: (613) 241-3344
Fax: (613) 241-1971
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PARISA REZAIEFAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REZAIEFAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2003