Rezieg, Mohammad Awad (CPSO#: 64739)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 1993

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 31 Dec 1993
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Apr 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1993