Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Rheault, Jean Gerald (CPSO#: 63159)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 23 Oct 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 23 Oct 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Ottawa, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 15 Nov 1967 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Oct 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Oct 1998