Rheault, Paul Luc Claude (CPSO#: 66824)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
417 Lasalle Blvd.
Sudbury ON  P3A 1W8
Phone: (705) 671-3001
Fax: 7056713003
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Paul Rheault Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 04 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Rheault ( CPSO# 66824 )

Business Address:
202 - 1280 Lasalle Boulevard
Sudbury ON  P3A 1Y8
Phone Number: (705) 671-3003

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL LUC CLAUDE RHEAULT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RHEAULT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1995