Rheaume, Caroline (CPSO#: 75419)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Laval University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 2007 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 27 Aug 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2001