Rheaume, Dorianne Elizebeth (CPSO#: 51698)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 23 Nov 1988

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 23 Nov 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Nov 1988