Rhodes, Ian Nelson (CPSO#: 53828)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 May 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621 Ext. 4525
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ian Rhodes Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 26 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Rhodes ( CPSO# 53828 )

Business Address:
Monfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa
Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site Ottawa
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IAN NELSON RHODES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RHODES is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 May 1989