Rhydderch, Gareth Mervyn (CPSO#: 32553)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 14 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Jun 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gareth Rhydderch Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 30 2013

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St. Regis Crescent S. Toronto, Ontario M3J 1Y6 Tel: (416) 398-0638 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 Fax: (416) 398-5932 Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 03 Jul 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 24 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 May 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Jun 2013

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: February 7, 2014
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Undertaking by Dr. Gareth Mervyn Rhydderch to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the “College”). (NOTE: This is a summary of the undertaking. For the complete terms, contact the College’s Membership Department):

I, Dr. Gareth Mervyn Rhydderch:
(2) Acknowledge that I was the subject of investigations by the College regarding whether I have committed an act of professional misconduct or am incompetent (the “Investigations”). Without restricting the foregoing, I understand that the College was investigating allegations with respect to my prescribing of narcotics and medical marijuana.
(3) Executed an Undertaking with the College on May 2, 2013 resigning my privileges to prescribe Restricted Substances as defined in that Undertaking (the “Cease Prescribing Undertaking”).
(4) Executed a second Undertaking with the College on May 14, 2013, agreeing to take certain actions in respect of specified patients as set out in that Undertaking (the “Patient Follow-Up Undertaking”). I confirm that I have complied with the terms of that Undertaking and confirm that all actions therein have been completed.
(5) Executed a third Undertaking with the College on June 12, 2013, resigning my certificate of registration with the College as of June 14, 2013 (the “Voluntary Resignation Undertaking”). This Undertaking replaces and supercedes the Cease Prescribing Undertaking, Patient Follow-Up Undertaking and the Voluntary Resignation Undertaking.
(6) Acknowledge that there has been no referral to the Discipline Committee of the College in respect of the Investigations.
(7) Confirm that I resigned from the College effective June 14, 2013.
(8) Hereby undertake not to apply or re-apply for registration to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
(14) Acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand the terms and conditions provided in this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.