Riaz, Salman (CPSO#: 80490)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 17 Dec 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 Dec 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Nishtar Medical College, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2004 to 24 Mar 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 25 Mar 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 17 Dec 2004
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Dec 2004