Ribchinsky, Sofia (CPSO#: 93553)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Carleton Place DM Hospital
211 Lake Avenue E
Carleton Place, ON K7C 1J4
Carleton Place ON  K7C 1J4
Phone: (613) 864-8369
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

75 Spring Street
Almonte ON  K0A 1K0
Canada
Phone: (613)864-8369
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07

1220 Place d'Orléans Drive
Orleans ON  K1C 7K3
Canada
Phone: (613)864-8369
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Canada
Phone: (613)864-8369
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Ribchinsky Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 25 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ribchinsky ( CPSO# 93553 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Family Medicine
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1H 8H2
Phone Number: (613) 761-4000

Business Address:
75 Spring Street
Almonte ON  K0A 1A0
Phone Number: (613) 256-2500

Business Address:
211 Lake Avenue East
Carleton Place ON  K7C 1J4
Phone Number: (613) 257-2200

Business Address:
100-1220 Place D'Orleans Drive
Orleans ON  K1C 7K3
Phone Number: (613) 841-5389

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SOFIA RIBCHINSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIBCHINSKY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012