Ribeiro, Igo Barbosa (CPSO#: 94802)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Universidade Federal Do Ceara, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa
Ottawa Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone: 6137614313 Ext. 10601
Fax: 6137615107
Electoral District: 07

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IGO BARBOSA RIBEIRO shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. RIBEIRO is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA;

(2) Dr. RIBEIRO shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. RIBEIRO is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. RIBEIRO shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. RIBEIRO is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. RIBEIRO no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2011 to 25 Mar 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 26 Mar 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2012 to 31 Jul 2012
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Vascular Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018