Ribeiro, Luciana Torres (CPSO#: 83652)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Dec 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Portuguese

Education:Universidade Federal de Minas Gerais, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences
Department of Radiology
P O Box 2000
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 46911
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Luciana Ribeiro Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 16 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Ribeiro ( CPSO# 83652 )

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences
Department of Radiology
P O Box 2000
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 31 Dec 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LUCIANA TORRES RIBEIRO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIBEIRO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2005 to 31 Oct 2005
Assessment Verification Period - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2005 to 31 Aug 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2006 to 31 Aug 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2007 to 31 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neuroradiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2010