Ribeiro, Marcos (CPSO#: 85717)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Oct 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Oct 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Faculdade Medicina de Santo Amaro, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Nov 2006 to 04 Feb 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 05 Feb 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Oct 2009
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Occupational Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Occupational Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Oct 2011
Clinical Fellow - Occupational Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 13 Nov 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2011