Ricci, Joseph Alan (CPSO#: 33057)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jan 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jan 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Corcare Inc
Suite 410
325 Milner Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1B 5N1
Phone: (416) 284-4744
Fax: (416) 284-0141
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Court
2863 Ellesmere Road
Suite 307
Scarborough
Toronto ON  M1E 5E9
Canada
Phone: (416) 284-4744
Fax: (416) 284-0141
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Suite 200A
1105 Kingston Road
Pickering ON  L1V 1B5
Canada
Phone: (416) 284-4744
Fax: (416) 284-0141
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joseph Ricci Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 24 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ricci ( CPSO# 33057 )

Business Address:
410 - 325 Milner Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1B 5N1
Phone Number: (416) 284-4744

Business Address:
The Court
307 - 2863 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 5E9
Phone Number: (416) 284-4744

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Centenary Hospital
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131

Business Address:
Rouge Valley-Ajax Pickering Hospital
580 Harwood Avenue
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone Number: (905) 683-2320

Business Address:
200A - 1105 Kingston Road
Pickering ON  L1V 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 284-4744

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 03 Dec 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 01 Dec 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEPH ALAN RICCI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RICCI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 1982